Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dalby, Barbara, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Derryberry, Daryl L, Goudarzi, Brent, Zips, Craig D, against Crosson, Mikeal, Hunt Oil Company, represented by Fletcher, Douglas D, Katherine, Compton, Toles, William M., White, Christopher C, Zimmer, Scott, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 116th District Court with PARKER, TONYA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePARKER, TONYA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House116th District Court |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: August 23, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 13, 2021JURY DEMAND
Date: September 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - Civil (Level 3) |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING OF MEDICAL AFFIDAVITS AFFIDAVIT |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING OF MEDICAL AFFIDAVITS AFFIDAVIT |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLTF NOTICE OF FILING MEDICAL AFFIDAVITS AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF FILING MEDICAL |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING MEDICAL AFFIDAVITS AFFIDAVIT |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING MEDICAL RECORDS AFFIDAVITS AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF FILING MEDICAL RECORDS |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES) |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING OF MEDICAL AFFIDAVITS AFFIDAVIT NOITCE OF FILING OF MEDICAL AFFIDAVITS |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF FILING |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.