Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ortiz, Consuelo, Ortiz, Leovardo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mathis, Kyle, Ripper, Phillip, against Remedy Trucking Llc, Solomon, Ephrem, represented by Evans, Carin "Cj", Gallegos, Adam C., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 14th District Court with MOYE', ERIC presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOYE', ERIC Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House14th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is filed by Consuelo Ortiz and Leovardo Ortiz against Ephrem Solomon and Remedy Trucking, LLC. The plaintiffs state that they were involved in a collision with a white 2009 Freightliner tractor-trailer operated by Ephrem Solomon, who w...
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: August 23, 2021NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 29, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Hearing | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER OF AGREED DISMISSAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
MAILED TO PHILLIP RIPPER NOTE - CLERKS COPY OF DISMISSAL ORDER MAILED TO PLTF AND DEF. |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR DISPOSITION NOTICES MAILED |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER REGARDING SETTLEMENT SETTLED |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - EPHREM SOLOMON CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION EFHREM SOLOMON |
|
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION CRICKET WIRELESS D/B/A AT&T CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION CRICKET WIRELESS D/B/A AT&T |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.