Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mccormack, John N., filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Seifert, R Scott, against Industrial Labs Llc, represented by Dell, Paul G., Garrey, Robert James, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 68th District Court with HOFFMAN, MARTIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHOFFMAN, MARTIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2021 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House68th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 23, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: October 13, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION ON PETITION TO TAKE DEPOSITION MOTION HEARING 30 MIN RULE 202 SANDRA LACROX 214/868-8720 BY ZOOM |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Cover Sheet (General) NOTE - CLERKS ORDER TAKE DEPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER TO TAKE DEPOSITION NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER TO TAKE DEPOSITION |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED NOTICE HEARING:INDUSTRIAL LABS LLC RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - INDUSTRIAL LABS, LLC RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION ON PETITION TO TAKE DEPOSITION NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT ON PETITION TO TAKE DEPOSITION |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION INDUSTRIAL LABS LLC |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
ISSUE CITATION - INDUSTRIAL LABS LLC ISSUE CITATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.