Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Gomez, Indv, Roberto R., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Pletta, Timothy Gerard, against Ironwood Crossing Public Facility Corp, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 193rd District Court with WHITMORE, BRIDGETT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWHITMORE, BRIDGETT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2021 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House193rd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
The plaintiff, Roberto R. Gomez, is suing the defendant, Facility Corporation, for failure to pay for goods and services pursuant to an agreement. Gomez was to provide painting and cleaning services to Facility Corporation, d/b/a Judicial District, d...
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: October 28, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: August 20, 2021NOTE - CLERKS
Date: November 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
193RD Initial Dismissal Notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL MAILED NOTE - CLERKS |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
193RD Initial Dismissal Notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
193RD Initial Dismissal Notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION 1st REQUEST IN PERSON TO RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET FOR 45 DAYS |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - IRON CROSSING PUBLIC FACILITY CORPORATION D/B/A THE HENDERSON APARTMENTS RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION IRON CROSSING PUBLIC FACILITY CORPORATION D/B/A THE HENDERSON APARTMENTS |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION- IRON CROSSING PUBLIC ISSUE CITATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.