Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Gomez, Roberto R., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Pletta, Timothy Gerard, against Ironwood Crossing Public Facility Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 193rd District Court with WHITMORE, BRIDGETT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWHITMORE, BRIDGETT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2021 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House193rd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: October 22, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: August 20, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: August 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
193RD Initial Dismissal Notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL MAILED NOTE - CLERKS |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
193RD Initial Dismissal Notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
193RD Initial Dismissal Notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION 1st REQUEST BY EMAIL TO RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET FOR 45 DAYS |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - IRONWOOD CROSSING PUBLIC FACILITY CORPORATION RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION IRONWOOD CROSSING PUBLIC FACILITY CORPORATION |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
ISSUE CITATION - IRONWOOD CROSSING PUBLIC FACILITY CORP. ISSUE CITATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.