Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Fgl Solutions, Llc, Footbridge Capital, Llc, Old Hill Partners, Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Bragalone, Jeffrey R, against Revere Capital Management, Lp, Revere High Yield Fund Lp, represented by Lilley, John W, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with WYSOCKI, ASHLEY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWYSOCKI, ASHLEY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2021 |
CategoryGarnishment |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court House44th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 24, 2021ORDER - WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: August 19, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
MAIILED COPY ORDER TO JOHN W LILLEY III NOTE - CLERKS COPY ORDER TO ALL PARTIES |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION OF NONSUIT/DISMISSAL MOTION - NONSUIT |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF NONSUIT/ DISMISAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND NONSUIT |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference EMAILED 10/15 DATE TO PARTIES, NO NOTICE MAILED |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference EMAILED STATUS CONF NOTICE TO D 9/13/21 |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL ANSWER M ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT:REVERE CAPITAL MANAGEMENT LP RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT: REVERE HIGH YIELD FUND LP RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.