Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cisco, Alfred B., Iii, Cisco, Ryan J., Foley, Joseph, Garcia, Courtney Dean, Jenkins, Frances, (total of 8) See All filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Eunice, Fernandez, Purdue, Keith C., Robertson, Frank W, Salinas, George L, Jr, Salinas, George L, Jr., (total of 5) See All against Federal Express Corporation Doing Business As Fedex Express, Fedex Ground Package System, Inc., Gonzalez, Marcos, Gonzalez, Martir, Mata, David, (total of 8) See All represented by Aspy, P Clark, Barger, Jessica Zavadil, Cathey, Brian James, Parks, S Todd, Rolen, Aaron J., (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 192nd District Court with ACEVES, MARIA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeACEVES, MARIA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 23, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House192nd District Court |
This is a complaint filed in Texas state court by the plaintiffs Courtney Dean Garcia, Alfred B. Cisco, III, and Ryan J. Cisco, as wrongful death beneficiaries and heirs of Joy H. Cisco, deceased, against the defendants XPO Logistics Freight, Inc., a...
REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: July 23, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: August 19, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Notice Final Disposition Hearing |
|
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION WILLIAM MESSERSCHMIDT |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
CATHERINE WAKEHAM M.D. CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION |
|
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - ROGER CHARLES ALLEN CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION ROGER CHARLES ALLEN |
|
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL HEARING Continuation of pretrial hearing |
|
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa Jury Trial - Civil |
|
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL HEARING | |
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | SETTLED | |
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE/DEFS RESPONSE/PLTFS EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY/MICHAEL CONNELLY RESPONSE DEFS RESPONSE/PLTFS EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY/MICHAEL CONNELLY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.