Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Scott-Patton, Kelly, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Clark, M Inez, against Clark, Kiley Anne, Craft, Karshia, State Farm Lloyds, represented by Plummer, Travis E, Shapiro, Ashley K, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTILLERY, DALE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 23, 2021 |
CategoryOther Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a legal case filed by Kelly Scott-Patton against State Farm Lloyds, Kiley Anne Clark, and Karshia Craft. The suit seeks to recover damages resulting from the defendants' refusal to pay insurance benefits under a homeowner's policy. ...
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 23, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 13, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
134th Trial Notice Letters Jury Trial - Civil |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL ORDER MAILED TO ALL (2) NOTE - CLERKS |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE MOTION - DISMISS JOINT/ WITH PREJUDICE |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
KARSHIA CRAFT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TRIAL w LEVEL 1 USO NOTICE OF TRIAL |
|
September 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER (LEVEL 1) |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT KILEY ANNE CLARK'S ORIGINAL ANSWER ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL JURY DEMAND & REQUEST FOR REQUIRED DISCLOSURES |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT KILEY ANNE CLARK'S ORIGINAL ANSWER JURY DEMAND |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - KILEY ANNE CLARK RETURN OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.