Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Foley, Carol J., Mills, Erica J., filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Allan, William N, Iv, against Western Mutual Insurance Company, represented by Greer, Darrell R, Pappas, Chris C, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 68th District Court with HOFFMAN, MARTIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHOFFMAN, MARTIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 20, 2021 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House68th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 19, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 20, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL ORDER MAILED TO ALL (2) NOTE - CLERKS |
|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR FWD DISML ORDER TO CLERKS |
|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR FWD ORDER TO DISM TO JUDGE FOR REV |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFFS' MOTION DISMISS MOTION - DISMISS |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER DISMISS NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT DISMISS |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | RULE 11 | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | RULE 11 | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | JURY DEMAND | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED RETURN OF CITATION WESTERN MUTUAL INSURANCE COMP RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED RETURN OF CITATION - WESTERN MUTUAL INSURANCE COMP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.