Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Andrews, Mary, Andrews, Michael, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Allan, William N, Iv, against Ballew, Charles, State Farm Lloyds, Inc., represented by Martini, Richard Paul, Wall, Rachel E, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 68th District Court with HOFFMAN, MARTIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHOFFMAN, MARTIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 20, 2021 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House68th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 20, 2021MOTION - NONSUIT
Date: August 03, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
UNEXECUTED RETURN OF CERT MAIL CITATION - CHARLES BALLEW - 9214 8901 0661 5400 0164 8569 76 RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
MAILED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO NONSUIT TO WILLAM ALLAN NOTE - CLERKS ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS, STATE FARM LLOYD'S, INC. AND CHARLES BALLEW TO ALL PARTIES |
|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - STATE FARM LLYODS ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL ANSWER/SPECIAL EXCEPTION-CHARLES BALLEW ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL SPECIAL EXCEPTION |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION - NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER TO NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER TO NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDCIE |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED RETURN OF CITATION STATE FARM LLOYDS, INC. RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED RETURN OF CITATION - STATE FARM LLOYDS, INC. |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION CHARLES BALLEW - 9214 8901 0661 5400 0164 8569 76 |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION STATE FARM LLOYDS, INC. - 9214 8901 0661 5400 0164 8563 58 |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.