Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Equipmentshare.Com, Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Wallace, Richard J, Iii, against Arraycon Construction Llc, Arraycon, Inc., Array Construction Llc, represented by Tolliver, Marcus L, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 14th District Court with MOYE', ERIC presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOYE', ERIC Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 20, 2021 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House14th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 08, 2021NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: October 11, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 20, 2021AMENDED PETITION
Date: January 06, 2022RULE 11
Date: January 06, 2022NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: December 15, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 19, 2022NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: October 03, 2022ISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS
Date: November 12, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 22, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: January 06, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 21, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: January 19, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 18, 2022AMENDED PETITION
Date: November 12, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: July 20, 2021NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: January 19, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Non Jury Trial | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF AGREED JUDGMENT RULE 306(a)(3) NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
REGARDING AGREED MEDIATOR CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (SOS)- UNEXECUTED CITATION - ARRAYCON INC RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER LVL 2 |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TRIAL AND LVL 2 S/O MAILED |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL ANSWER ARRAYCON, INC. ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
CITATION ARRAY CONSTRUCTION LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.