Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Holman, Denise, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Daspit, John Arthur, Du, Thompson, against Fiesta Mart, L.L.C., represented by Cox, Maryalyce W, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 160th District Court with REDMOND, AIESHA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREDMOND, AIESHA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 19, 2021 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House160th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is filed by Plaintiff Denise Holman against Defendant Fiesta Mart, L.L.C. The complaint states that the plaintiff intends to conduct discovery under Level 3 of the Texas Rules of Civil Procedure. The claims asserted arise under the com...
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 19, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 16, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
AMENDED DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES) AMENDED |
|
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF-DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES) PLAINTIFF |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
160th Dismissal DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION CASE FILED 7-19-21; DEFS UNSERVED |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT DEFENDANT |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - FIESTA, INC. RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED CITATION - FIESTA |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION FIESTA MART, L.L.C. |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE LETTER CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ISSUE CITATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.