Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Barberena, Leslie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Trevino, Yvette S., against Mendez, Karina Gissele, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with WILLIAMS, STACI presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, STACI Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 19, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 19, 2021NOTE - CLERKS
Date: September 07, 2021ORDER - NONSUIT
Date: August 24, 2021MOTION - NONSUIT
Date: August 09, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 09, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: October 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
101st Dismissal Letter - 2017 DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
MAILED YVETTE TREVINO COPY OF NONSUIT ORDER NOTE - CLERKS MAILED COPY OF NONSUIT ORDER |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER - NONSUIT PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPABY |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
(PROP) ORD GRANTING PLTF'S MTN FOR NON-SUIT W/ PREJUDICE AGAINST DFT, PROGRESSIVE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NON-SUIT WITH PREJUDICE AGAINST DEFENDANT, PROGRESSIVE |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION - NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE AGAINST DEFENDANT, PROGRESSIVE |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR PARTIAL NON-SUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION - NONSUIT AGAINST KARINA GISSELE MENDEZ WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER FOR PARTIAL NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION KARINA MENDEZ |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.