Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Onubogu, Ifeatu, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Kaiser, Donald, against Idemili Foundation, Inc. Dallas Ft. Worth, Igbo Community Association Nigeria, Dfw, Inc, Ndukwe, Ben, Nwokocha, Edwin, Orafunam, Tony, (total of 5) See All represented by Akpom, Okey, Norman, Marcus D, Nwokocha, Cordelia Anakwue, Onyenah, Kenneth C, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 116th District Court with PARKER, TONYA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePARKER, TONYA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 16, 2021 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedApril 05, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House116th District Court |
Ifeatu Onubogu, in her capacity as Chief Financial Officer of Igbo Community Association of Nigeria, DFW, Inc. (ICAN), is suing ICAN for declaratory judgment and injunctive relief. Onubogu alleges that she discovered irregularities in ICAN's financia...
Non Jury Trial
Date: April 08, 2024Motion - Protect
Date: January 10, 2024MOTION - DISMISS
Date: November 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
NON JURY TRIAL NOTICE - DO NOT USE Non Jury Trial (3 days) |
|
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Non Jury Trial CARRIED FROM 1-22-2024 (3 days) |
|
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion - Continuance SET BY JUDGE. VIA PHONE |
|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
NON JURY TRIAL NOTICE - DO NOT USE Non Jury Trial (Level 2) 3 DAYS |
|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER ON EMERGENCY MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO EMERGENCY MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL. RESPONSE TO EMERGENCY MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL |
|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
EMERGENCY MOTION TO CONTINUE MOTION - CONTINUANCE EMERGENCY |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS CC REC'D FOR 1/22 TRIAL |
|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TRIAL SUB-B NDUKWE MISCELLANOUS EVENT |
|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TRIAL SUB-T OFARUNAM MISCELLANOUS EVENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.