Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Nobles, Demarcus, Thornton, Elisha, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Eldridge, V. Paige, against Thomas, Dequann, Three Brothers Moving Inc., represented by Walters, Randall G, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 95th District Court with PURDY, MONICA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePURDY, MONICA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 16, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House95th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 16, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 14, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: September 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
95TH JURY TRIAL NOTICE I Jury Trial - Civil L3 |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
MAILED AGREED DISMISSAL TO RANDALL G WALTERS NOTE - CLERKS MAILED ORDER TO ALL PARTIES |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS MOTION - DISMISS AGREED |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED DISMISSAL ORDER NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
AGEED SCHEDULING ORDER SCHEDULING ORDER AGREED |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR Scheduling Order e-mailed to counsel. |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLTF/1ST AMENDED PETITION AMENDED PETITION FIRST |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLT/ NOTICE OF SERVICE AND FILING AFFIAVITS & CERTIFIED COPIES AFFIDAVIT PLTF/NOTICE OF SERVICE & FILING RECORD AFFIDAVITS & CERTIFIED COPIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.