Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Adeogun, Olawale, against Black Gold Industries Llc, Roberts, Van, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 193rd District Court with WHITMORE, BRIDGETT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWHITMORE, BRIDGETT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2021 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House193rd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a Plaintiff's Original Petition filed by American Express National Bank against Van Roberts and Black Gold Industries LLC in the 193rd Judicial District Court of Dallas County, Texas. The Plaintiff is seeking monetary relief of $5,4...
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 15, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 15, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL MAILED NOTE - CLERKS |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
193RD Initial Dismissal Notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDMENT MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
193RD Initial Dismissal Notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION 3rd REQUEST BY EMAIL TO RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET FOR 15 DAYS |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
193RD Initial Dismissal Notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
193RD Initial Dismissal Notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION 2nd REQUEST BY EMAIL TO RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET FOR 45 DAYS |
|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
193RD Initial Dismissal Notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION 1st REQUEST BY MOTION TO RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET FOR 30 DAYS |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - VAN ROBERTS RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET MOTION - RETAIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.