Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Amos Financial Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hoefker, Paul A, against Ican Financial Inc., Macdonald, Raymond, represented by Berry, Bredric, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 95th District Court with PURDY, MONICA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePURDY, MONICA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2021 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House95th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 15, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: July 16, 2021REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: July 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER DENY MOTION NEW TRIAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
PLTF/RESPONSE TO DEF/MOTION NEW TRIAL RESPONSE |
|
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
ABSTRACT JUDGMENT ICAN FINANCIAL INC. |
|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL MOTION - NEW TRIAL |
|
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event | ISSUE ABSTRACT | |
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SERVICE | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
95th Dispo Notice Settled II Final Disposition Hearing Suit filed 7/15/21. Interlocutory Default Judgment filed 4/20/22. |
|
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PARTIAL NONSUIT AS TO DEF(RAYMOND MACDONALD) ORDER - PARTIAL NONSUIT AS TO DEF(RAYMOND MACDONALD) |
|
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT RULE 239(a)-BREDRIC BERRY NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.