Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Hopkins, Roy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lee, Ryan K., Smith, G David, against Ed Bell Construction Co., Inc., Ed Bell Investments, Inc., represented by Clay, William J, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 192nd District Court with WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, KRISTINA M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House192nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 14, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 24, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: August 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
192nd Cover Letter Jury Trial - Civil |
|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL - G DAVID SMITH NOTE - CLERKS - MAILED COPIES/ORDER OF DISMISSAL/ALL PARTIES |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION DISMISS-AGREED MOTION - DISMISS AGREED |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE MOTION - DISMISS AGREED WITH PREJUDICE |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING... AFFIDAVIT - NOTICE OF FILING SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVITS |
|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT/NOTICE FILING AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.