Case Last Refreshed: 10 hours ago
Malone, Dwain, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Chaiken, Robert L, against Advanced Kidney Care Of North Texas, Pllc, Beacon Emergency Services Team, Pa, Curry, Matthew W., Md, Erwin Jr, Gary, Md, Healthtexas Provider Network, (total of 9) See All represented by Bailey, Ty, Dunnill, William, Scully, John A, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with WILLIAMS, STACI presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, STACI Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2021 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Dwain Malone, individually and as representative of the Estate of Linda Malone (‘Plaintiff’) files this Original Petition complaining of Texas Heart Hospital of the Southwest LLP d/b/a Baylor Scott & White The Heart Hospital — Plano; Matthew W. Curry...
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 18, 2024Jury Trial - Civil
Date: November 11, 2024Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: June 20, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021 Jury Trial - Civil |
|
June 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED SUMMARY JUDGMENT Motion - Summary Judgment 30M MSJ VIA ZOOM CC REQ YEVETTE ZAMORA 9038133900 |
|
June 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
LETTER RE: PROPOSED SUMMARY JUDGMENT Motion - Summary Judgment 30M MSJ VIA ZOOM CC REQ YEVETTE ZAMORA 9038133900 |
|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT AMENDED RE: DEFENDANTS' NO-EVIDENCE MSJ |
|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
E-SERVED COPY OF ORDER PARTIAL NONSUIT ORDER |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PARTIAL NONSUIT PARTIAL - DEFS DOUGLAS A SHEENA AND BEACON EMERGENCY SERVICES TEAM PA |
|
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Motion - Summary Judgment 30M - D/NO EVID MSJ - BRIDGETT MICIOTTO - 214-954-2212 - CC REQ'D - ***ZOOM HEARING** |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOH CANCELLATION RE: DEFS NO EVID MSJ - 03/25/2024 - 11:00AM NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT CANCELLATION RE: DEFS NO EVID MSJ - 03/25/2024 - 11:00AM |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER ON PARTIAL NONSUIT |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PARTIAL NONSUIT NOTICE OF NONSUIT PARTIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.