Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Alive And Thriving, Inc., filed a(n) Property case represented by Conry, Christopher S, against Hot Topic, Inc., represented by White, Christopher C, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 162nd District Court with WYSOCKI, ASHLEY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWYSOCKI, ASHLEY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2021 |
CategoryProperty |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House162nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: July 14, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 13, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Non Jury Trial | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL HEARING | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
AGREED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE MOTION - CONTINUANCE AGREED |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED CONTINUANCE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED AGREED CONTINUACE |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED ORDER CONTINUE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
162nd Cover Letter Non Jury Trial |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE AGREED |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER AGREED CONTINUANCE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
MAXINE YANG CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.