Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Simpson, Renee, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Davis, Arnesia B, against Trh Legacy Group, Llc., represented by Whitehurst, David Walton, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTILLERY, DALE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2021 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This is an Original Petition and Request for Disclosure filed by Renee Simpson against TRH Legacy Group, LLC. Simpson is an individual resident of Dallas County, Texas, and TRH Legacy Group, LLC. may be served through its registered agent of service,...
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 09, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 13, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: August 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
134th Trial Notice Letters Jury Trial - Civil |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION RENEE SIMPSON |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
1ST AMENDED MOTION NEW TRIAL MOTION - NEW TRIAL 1ST AMENDED |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion - New Trial 15 MIN RENEE SIMPSON 972-415-4427 (hearing held, ruling issued) |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion - New Trial 15 MIN RENEE SIMPSON 972-415-4427 |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO MOTION NEW TRIAL RESPONSE TO MOTION NEW TRIAL |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DENY MOTION NEW TRIAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT DENY MOTION NEW TRIAL |
|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL MOTION - NEW TRIAL |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM - UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.