Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Seaspine Sales Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Bukaty, Mark A, against Ethicus Hospital Dfw Llc, Psn Affiliates, Llc, represented by Siegel, Merrill Drew, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 116th District Court with PARKER, TONYA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePARKER, TONYA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 12, 2021 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House116th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 28, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 28, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
UNEXECUTED WRIT OF EXECUTION - PSN AFFILLIATES LLC RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXECUTION (1) 227 /269 PSN AFFILIATES, LLC |
|
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR WRIT OF EXECUTION REQUEST FOR SERVICE |
|
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | ISSUE WRIT | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF JUDGMENT RULE 306(a)(3) NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT Motion - Summary Judgment 30M - P/M/SJ - TELEPHONIC HEARING - MARK BUKATY - 214-672-9360 |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Motion - Summary Judgment 30M - P/M/SJ - TELEPHONIC HEARING - MARK BUKATY - 214-672-9360. COUNSEL PROVIDED CALL-IN INFO |
|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
NON SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER-FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
1ST AMENDED ANSWER AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL 1ST |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.