Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Seaspine Sales Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Bukaty, Mark A, against Group Surgical Partners Integrated Llc, Psn Affiliates, Llc, represented by Siegel, Merrill Drew, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 68th District Court with HOFFMAN, MARTIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHOFFMAN, MARTIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 12, 2021 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House68th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This is a civil complaint for monetary relief stemming from the defendants' alleged failure to pay for goods and services provided by the plaintiff. The plaintiff, SeaSpine Sales LLC, and the defendant, Group Surgical Partners Integrated LLC, have a ...
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 06, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 28, 2021MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTION (1) PSN AFFILIATES LLC AND GROUP SURGICAL PARTNERS INTEGRATED LLC DBA |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
ISSUE WRIT PER ATTORNEY, PLEASE EMAIL INSTEAD OF MAILING |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SERVICE | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
ABSTRACT JUDGMENT PSN AFFILIATES, LLC AND GROUP SURGICAL PARTNERS INTEGRATED LLC DBA |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SERVICE | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF JUDGMENT RULE 306(a)(3) NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | ISSUE ABSTRACT | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT Motion - Summary Judgment P/M/SUM JUDGMENT, 15M, MARK BUKATY, 214-672-9360 |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS FINAL JUDGMENT RETURNED UNSIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.