Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Coca, Sandy, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Genthe, Aaron L, against Leaders Bilingual Academy, represented by Cazes-Greene, Mary Amy, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 68th District Court with HOFFMAN, MARTIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHOFFMAN, MARTIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 12, 2021 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House68th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 14, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 12, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 23, 2021ORDER - MISC.
Date: September 03, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 27, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 02, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: October 25, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 02, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 07, 2021MOTION - DISMISS
Date: October 07, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 16, 2021ORDER - APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: July 23, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: September 02, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 02, 2021ORDER - ATTORNEY FEES
Date: September 03, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 02, 2021MOTION - GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: July 19, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 03, 2021RETURNED MAIL
Date: October 27, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 19, 2021NOTE - CLERKS
Date: October 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION 1ST RESET ON DWOP - WAITING ON FINAL JDGMNT MLD NTCS TO ALL PARTIES |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Cover Sheet (General) NOTE - CLERKS ORDER DISMISS TO PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR FWD DISML ORDER TO JUDGE'S QUEUE |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED ORDER DISMISS NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT DISMISS |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION DISMISS AGREED MOTION - DISMISS |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR ***MOTION TO RETAIN WAS NOT SIGNED - ATTYS WILL NEED TO SHOW TO HEARING*** |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION 1ST WAITING ON FINAL JDGMNT - JUDGE APPV'D PROVE UP AT LAST HRG -MLD NTCS TO ALL PARTIES |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER RETAIN NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT RETAIN |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION - RETAIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.