Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Quest Behavioral Medical Solutions, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Davis, Amy E, against La Plaza Wellness, Skinner, Russell, represented by O'Neil, Debran Lee Ann, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 160th District Court with REDMOND, AIESHA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREDMOND, AIESHA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 12, 2021 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House160th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 12, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 21, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Notice Final Disposition Hearing |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
COVER SHEET NOTE - CLERKS MAILED COVER SHEETS AND ORDER OF NONSUIT TO PLAINTIFF/DEFENDANTS' ATTORNEYS |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
160th Scheduling Conference Notice Scheduling Conference |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
NON SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER-ORDER OF NONSUIT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER OF NONSUIT |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF-NOTICE OF NONSUIT NOTICE OF NONSUIT |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
160th Dismissal DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION CASE FILED 7-09-21; DEFS UNSERVED |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
SETTLED LETTER SETTLED |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - RUSSELL SKINNER, M.D. ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.