Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jones, Alihalji, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Alexander, Joshua W, Alexander, Josh W, against Bradford, Stanley, Service One Transport, Inc., represented by Ingram, T. Glenn, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with WILLIAMS, STACI presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, STACI Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 06, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a plaintiff's original petition and request for discovery in a legal case. The plaintiff, Alihalji Jones, is filing a lawsuit against Stanley Bradford and Service One Transport, Inc. The complaint alleges that on or about September ...
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 06, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 10, 2021NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT
Date: August 26, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: July 06, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021 DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - STANLEY BRADFORD AND SERVICE ONE TRANSPORT, INS. ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVICE ONE TRANSPORT, INC |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION STANLEY BRADFORD |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
ISSUE CITATION: SERVICE ONE TRANSPORT, INC ISSUE CITATION |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | NEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.