Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ben Abbott & Associates, Pllc, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Gerhart, John Thomas, Linyard, Grayson L, against Dc Injury Solutions Llc, Slocumb Law Firm, Pllc, represented by Milks, John D, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with WILLIAMS, STACI presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, STACI Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 06, 2021 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 10, 2021REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
101st Dismissal - Settled Settlement Conference |
|
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
MAILED JOHN GERHART COPY OF DISMISSAL ORDER NOTE - CLERKS MAILED COPY OF DISMISSAL ORDER |
|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021 Non Jury Trial |
|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NON-SUIT WITH PREJUDICE NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE |
|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST SLOCUMB LAW FIRM, LLC AND TO OVERRULE PRIVILEGE ASSERTIONS Motion - Sanctions PLT * CC INFO GIVEN TO GRAYSON LINYARD 214 468 3313 |
|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED SOS CITATION - DC INJURY SOLUTIONS, LLC RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS COURTESY COPIES - 03/25/2022 @ 11:45 AM - YELLOW ENVELOPE |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
CITATION SOS/COI/COH/HAG DC INJURY SOLUTIONS, LLC, |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION (SOS) - DC INJURY SOLUTIONS LLC RETURN OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.