Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Brown, Mary, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Shelton, Jeffrey D, against Randall'S Food & Drugs, Lp, Randall'S Food Markets, Inc., represented by Shelton, Jeffrey D, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 14th District Court with MOYE', ERIC presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOYE', ERIC Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 06, 2021 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House14th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 06, 2021NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 02, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
MAILED TO JEFFREY SHELTON NOTE - CLERKS COPY OF DISMISSAL ORDER MAILED TO PLTF. |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NONSUIT | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF NONSUIT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Hearing | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE LETTER TO FILE CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR DISPOSITION RESET - NOTICE MAILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.