Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Oncor Electric Delivery Company Llc, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Dukes, Jourdan J, against Gasaway, Aanisah, Pv Holding Corp, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 160th District Court with REDMOND, AIESHA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREDMOND, AIESHA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 02, 2021 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House160th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This is a civil lawsuit in which Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC (“Oncor”) is suing Aanisah Gasaway and PV Holding Corp. (“PV Holding”) for damages resulting from a car accident.
Oncor alleges that on July 30, 2019, Gasaway, while operating a ve...
REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: July 02, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 02, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT RULE 239(a) NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
160th Dismissal DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION 6TH SETTING; CASE FILED 7-2-21; DEFS UNSERVED; O/SUB SERVICE SIGNED 12-3-21 |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
NON SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER-DEFAULT JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF-MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION BY PUBLICATION - AANISAH GASAWAY RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANEOUS- PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE -AANISAH GASAWAY RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
160th Dismissal DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION 5TH SETTING; CASE FILED 7-2-21; DEFS UNSERVED; O/SUB SERVICE SIGNED 12-3-21 |
|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF-3RD MOTION TO RETAIN MOTION - RETAIN PLAINTIFF-3RD |
|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
NON SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER-3RD ORDER TO RETAIN NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT 3RD ORDER TO RETAIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.