Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Trevino Gonzalez, Juana, filed a(n) Property case represented by Bauguss, James L, Iii, against Wal-Mart Stores Texas, Llc, represented by Rhine, Bevan A, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with WYSOCKI, ASHLEY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWYSOCKI, ASHLEY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 06, 2021 |
CategoryProperty |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House44th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2021NOTE - CLERKS
Date: September 24, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
MAILED COPY TO JAMES L BAUGUSS III NOTE - CLERKS COPY ORDER TO PARTIES |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | SCHEDULING CONFERENCE | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference SETTLED PER 8/18/21 EMAIL FROM D, TOLD TO FILE SETTLEMENT LETTER |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER - SETTING SCHEDULING CONF | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - WAL-MART STORES TEXAS, LLC ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.