Case Last Refreshed: 23 hours ago
Morgan, Shakevia, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Itkin, Jason A., against Children'S Medical Center Dallas, Mendeloff, Eric N., Md, represented by Steed, Joel Jay, Sutker, Cory M, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with WILLIAMS, STACI presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, STACI Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 02, 2021 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedApril 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This is an original petition filed by Arnold Itkin LLP on behalf of Shakevia Morgan and A.W. against Children's Medical Center Dallas and Eric N. Mendeloff, MD.
Morgan alleges the following: AW. was born with an atrial ventricular septal defect and ...
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 06, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 26, 2021NOTE - CLERKS
Date: December 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021 Jury Trial - Civil |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE MAILED NOTE - CLERKS ORDR ACKNOWLEDGING NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE MAILED (3) |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED FOR NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER (LEVEL 3) NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S JURY DEMAND JURY DEMAND |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
101st Dismissal Letter - 2017 DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - CHILDREN'S MEDICAL CENTER DALLAS ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER DALLAS RETURN OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.