Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Porter, Tiffany, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lewis, Mikel Cplby, Lewis, Mikel Colby, against Cardinal Transport, Inc., Martinez, Richard, represented by Sargent, David Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 193rd District Court with WHITMORE, BRIDGETT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWHITMORE, BRIDGETT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House193rd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 26, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 24, 2021Jury Trial - Civil
Date: July 05, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: August 03, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 22, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 05, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: July 01, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: December 21, 2021CASE FILING COVER SHEET
Date: July 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 19, 2021ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: January 03, 2022MOTION - DISMISS
Date: June 23, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 23, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 21, 2021Jury Trial - Civil
Date: September 27, 2022REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: July 01, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 16, 2021JURY DEMAND
Date: July 26, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 08, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 19, 2021JURY DEMAND
Date: July 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
193rd Jury Trial Notice Whitmore Jury Trial - Civil |
|
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER LEVEL 3 Jury Trial - Civil |
|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS ORDER OF DISMISSAL MAILED |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION - DISMISSAL - AGREED MOTION - DISMISS AGREED MOTION |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING AGREED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT GRANTING AGREED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event | SCHEDULING ORDER | |
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED JOINT AGREED ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT AGREED AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
JOINT AGREED ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE |
|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
JOINT AGREED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE MOTION - CONTINUANCE JOINT AND AGREED MOTION |
|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
JOINT AGREED ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER GRANTING JOINT AND AGREED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.