Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Frank, Cheryl, filed a(n) Property case represented by Beesley, John Timothy, against Wehner Multifamily, Llc, represented by Eden, Robert Lee, Luckett, Jack M, Mayer, Zach T, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTILLERY, DALE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryProperty |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House134th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 01, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 02, 2021ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: September 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
134th Disposition Mondays Setting Final Disposition Hearing |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF AGREED JUDGMENT RULE 306(a)(3) NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER AGREED TAKE NOTHING JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT AGREED TAKE NOTHING JUDGMENT |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
134th Trial Notice Letters Jury Trial - Civil |
|
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION HEARING NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION HEARING |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
CHERYL FRANK CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION |
|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
134th Trial Notice Letters Non Jury Trial |
|
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL 09/26/22 9:00 NOTICE OF TRIAL JURY 09/26/22 9:00NOTICE OF TRIAL & ORDER/CONTINUANCE |
|
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR AGREED CONTINUANCE ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER FOR AGREED CONTINUANCE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.