Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Carter, Douglas, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Eldridge, V. Paige, against Qb Estates Llc, Qqt Trucking, Llc, Williams, Jerry, represented by Hellner, Robert W, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 116th District Court with PARKER, TONYA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePARKER, TONYA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House116th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: June 30, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 02, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - Civil Initial Trial Setting (Level 3) |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
MAILED ROBERT W HELLNER NOTE - CLERKS MAILED COPY OF ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE TO ALL PARTIES |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
RULE 11 AGREEMENT DISCOVERY DEADLINES RULE 11 AGREEMENT DISCOVERY DEADLINES |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER AGREED |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
116 Sched Conf Scheduling Conference |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVITS AFFIDAVIT PLT NTC OF SERVICE AND FILING AFFS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.