Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Arr1 A, Llc, Arr1 B, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kipp, Joshua D., against Bank Of Hope, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 116th District Court with PARKER, TONYA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePARKER, TONYA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryGarnishment |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court House116th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: June 30, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 03, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL RE ORDER OF NONSUIT & COVER SHEET |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL RE ORDER OF NONSUIT & COVER SHEET |
|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
MAILED TO BANK OF HOPE NOTE - CLERKS MAILED COPY OF ORDER OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO ALL PARTIES |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER ON NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
RE: PROPOSED ORDER ON NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT: BANK OF HOPE F/K/A BBCN BANK, SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO WILSHIRE BANK RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DONG JIN SEOK |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT BANK OF HOPE F/K/A BBCN BANK, SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO WILSHIRE BANK |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE SDJ & SYS INVESTMENT, INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.