Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Roof 911 Usa, Llc, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Barmore, Benjamin, Price, Jennifer P, Hunziker, Scott G, Wilson, David R, against Asian Lbj Realty Corp., The Northington Group, Llc, represented by Choe, Jason E, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 192nd District Court with ACEVES, MARIA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeACEVES, MARIA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
CategoryInsurance |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
Filing Court House192nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: June 17, 2021ORDER - RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET
Date: August 09, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: August 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION (2) - ALL PARTIES |
|
February 20, 2023 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Hearing | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa Jury Trial - Civil |
|
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | SETTLED | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa Jury Trial - Civil |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATION DEPOSITION/OI FAI WONG CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION OI FAI WONG |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL HEARING IN PERSON |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION WITHDRAW ATTORNEY/PLAINTIFF MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.