Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Katherine E Romero, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Robertson, Frank W, Mclendon, Andrew, against Centurion American Construcion Enterprises, Llc And Eliezer Fuentes, Fuentes, Eliezer, represented by Davis, Edward A, Greene, Adraon D, Jordan-Brown, Mckenzie L., Mayer, Zach T, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 14th District Court with MOYE', ERIC presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOYE', ERIC Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House14th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a wrongful death lawsuit filed by Katherine Elizabeth Romero, who is the beneficiary and heir of Luis Ventura, against Centurion American Construction Enterprises, LLC and Eliezer Fuentes. The plaintiff seeks monetary relief in exce...
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: June 17, 2021NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: August 10, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION ISABEL LOPEZ CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION ISABEL LOPEZ |
|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - ARACELY VELAZQUEZ CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION ARACELY VELAZQUEZ |
|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - NOE FUENTES CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION NOE FUENTES |
|
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
MAILED TO ADRAON GREENE NOTE - CLERKS COPY OF DISMISSAL MAILED TO PLTF AND DEF. |
|
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO RETAIN MOTION - RETAIN |
|
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
MAILED TO SERGIO ALEMAN NOTE - CLERKS COPY OF DISMISSAL MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. |
|
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER TO RETAIN NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DISMISSAL INTERVENORS AGAINST DEFENDANTS |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Hearing | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
INTERVENORS MOTION TO DISMISS MOTION - DISMISS INTERVENORS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.