Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Shenkenberg, Thomas, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Pearcy, Bryce Evan, against Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company, Hitchcock, Jenna, represented by Colaneri, Janet Kristina, Stilwell, John W, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 298th District Court with TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTOBOLOWSKY, EMILY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House298th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: June 17, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 20, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | CC TRANSFER | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFFS NOTICE FILING BUSINESS RECORDS AND AFFIDAVITS AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING BUSINESS RECORDS AND AFFIDAVITS |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS EFILED TRANSFER TO _COLLIN _____ CO. ENVELOPE # 57913454 _____ NEW CAUSE # 429-05477-2021 |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS EFILED TRANSFER TO _COLLIN _____ CO. ENVELOPE # 57913454 _____ NEW CAUSE # |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | CC TRANSFER | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS BILLING LETTER FOR TRANSFER TO COLLIN COUNTY EMAIL TO ALL LISTED PARTIES. CR |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ltr Filing Def 1st INT and RFP to Pla CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE: INTERROGATORIES |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTR/DEFENDANT CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE DEFENDANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.