Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Blackpine Innovations Inc, Harris, Conrad E., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Ritter, David D., against All Infinite Designs Llc, Element Enterprises, Llc, Singh, Moortaza, represented by Milam, Joshua S, Vogel, Jp B, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with FRAZIER, VERETTA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFRAZIER, VERETTA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 16, 2021 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House44th District Court |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 09, 2021ORDER - SETTING SCHEDULING CONF
Date: August 16, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 02, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: September 03, 2021MOTION - COMPEL
Date: December 09, 2021MOTION - COMPEL
Date: January 20, 2022ORDER - QUASH
Date: April 27, 2022ORDER - COMPEL
Date: January 26, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: January 10, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 16, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: November 16, 2021NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: December 03, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 14, 2022AMENDED PETITION
Date: January 10, 2022MOTION - CONTEMPT
Date: May 24, 2022RESPONSE
Date: April 22, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 26, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 24, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: September 07, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 19, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 21, 2021ORDER - TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER
Date: June 23, 2021ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: June 23, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 19, 2021AMENDED PETITION
Date: November 10, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: December 10, 2021CASE NOT SETTLED AT MEDIATION
Date: November 15, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 15, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 26, 2022MOTION - COMPEL
Date: February 14, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 13, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: November 17, 2021ORDER - COMPEL
Date: March 31, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 16, 2022MOTION - COMPEL
Date: February 14, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 31, 2022ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: December 03, 2021CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: April 21, 2022ORDER - COMPEL
Date: April 12, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: June 07, 2022MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: May 31, 2022MOTION - QUASH
Date: April 20, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 21, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 03, 2022ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: June 16, 2021Motion - Compel
Date: January 25, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: May 08, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: February 14, 2023MOTION - SET ASIDE
Date: October 12, 2023MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: October 11, 2023ORDER - STRIKE
Date: June 02, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: June 12, 2023MOTION - STRIKE
Date: May 22, 2023MOTION - RECONSIDER
Date: September 13, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: February 21, 2023ORDER - SHOW CAUSE (PREJUDGMENT) (OCA)
Date: June 21, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 02, 2023RESPONSE
Date: October 31, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: May 30, 2023ORDER - DENY
Date: October 09, 2023Motion - Reconsider
Date: October 06, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: November 13, 2023Motion - Strike
Date: June 02, 2023ORDER - JUDGMENT
Date: September 13, 2023Motion - Quash
Date: April 27, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 31, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: November 13, 2023MOTION HEARING
Date: November 03, 2023ORDER - DENY
Date: November 03, 2023Motion - Default Judgment
Date: December 08, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: June 01, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 12, 2023MOTION HEARING
Date: August 18, 2022RESPONSE
Date: May 31, 2023RESPONSE
Date: June 01, 2023RESPONSE
Date: October 03, 2023RESPONSE
Date: June 21, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: January 30, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: June 01, 2023Motion - Compel
Date: March 31, 2022JURY DEMAND
Date: May 05, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 24, 2023Motion - Default Judgment
Date: October 18, 2023NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING
Date: September 18, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 16, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 18, 2023Motion - Continuance
Date: December 03, 2021WITNESS LIST
Date: February 14, 2023ISSUE CITATION
Date: June 16, 2021NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: June 22, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 11, 2023NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: October 11, 2023Motion - Default Judgment
Date: September 13, 2023ORDER - PARTIAL NONSUIT
Date: October 13, 2023MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: September 05, 2023MISCELLANEOUS EVENT
Date: December 10, 2021MISCELLANEOUS EVENT
Date: May 31, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: May 30, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: June 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR DO NOT SET DAMAGES HEARING UNTIL M/SET ASIDE DEFAULT IS HEARD |
|
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT Motion - Default Judgment 1 HOUR PATSY LAWRENEE 214/295-5070 |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
ESERVED COVER LETTER - ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT MISCELLANOUS EVENT |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT ON MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER OF NONSUIT AND DISMISSAL OF ELEMENT ENTERPRISES, LLC MOTION HEARING MRN TO SET ASIDE * JOSH MILAM 8 432-934-7495 IN PERSON |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DENY OMTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT ORDER - DENY ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO MOTION SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT RESPONSE TO MOTION SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER DENY MOTION SET ASIDE DEFAULT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT DENY MOTION SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT Motion - Default Judgment ***BY SUBMISSION*** |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.