Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
7000S Chiesa Rd Series Llc, filed a(n) Property case represented by Safari, Maryam, against Taha Construction, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 298th District Court with TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTOBOLOWSKY, EMILY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 16, 2021 |
CategoryProperty |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House298th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a legal document filed by the plaintiff, 70005 Chiesa Rd Series LLC, against the defendant, Taha Construction, Inc. The plaintiff intends to conduct discovery in accordance with a Level 2 discovery control plan. The plaintiff seeks ...
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: June 16, 2021Final Disposition Hearing
Date: October 11, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE LETTER FOR ISSUE CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FORM REQUEST FOR SERVICE |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
ISSUE ABSTRACT NOT ISSUED - LEFT ATTORTNEY VOICEMAIL. THIS IS A RELEASE OF LIEN NO AMOUNTS AWARDED - ATTORNEY CALLED BACK AND SAID TO DISREGARD REQUEST |
|
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
NO ACTIVITY LETTER Final Disposition Hearing |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER DEFAULT JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - TAHA CONSTRUCTION, INC. RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION TAHA CONSTRUCTION INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.