Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Hua, Kien, Lin, Paul, Nguyen, Kinh, Zdfw Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Maxey, Brandon W., against Cowsins Llc, Hua, Hao "Johnny", Hua, Van Vivian, Led Emerge Llc, represented by Slim, Jules P, Wayne, Braden M., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with WYSOCKI, ASHLEY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWYSOCKI, ASHLEY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 15, 2021 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House44th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORDER - PROTECT
Date: September 02, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 02, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 31, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE TRIAL SETTING (JURY) |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
MAILED COPY ORDER TO JULES P SLIM NOTE - CLERKS COPY ORDER TO ALL PARTIES |
|
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL MOTION - DISMISS JOINT |
|
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED JOINT ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER CASE SETTLED CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
RULE 11 AGREEMENT REGARDING AMENDED PLEADINGS RULE 11 AGREEMENT REGARDING AMENDED PLEADINGS |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL ANSWER TO CROSS CLAIM-COUNTER PETITION -PLAINTIFF ORIGINAL ANSWER TO CROSS CLAIM - COUNTER PETITION PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.