Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Flexibility Capital, Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Deloney, Christopher, The Deloney Law Group, Pllc, against Broderick, Matthew, Geophysical Navigation Services, Lp, Mackinnon, Scott, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 116th District Court with PARKER, TONYA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePARKER, TONYA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2021 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House116th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
MOTION - RETAIN
Date: September 10, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 14, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | RELEASE OF JUDGMENT | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER - COMPEL DISCOVERY |
|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY Motion - Compel 30M - P/M/COMPEL (2X'S) - ALICIA ROBBIINS - 214--741-7911 - **IN PERSON HEARING** CC REQ'D |
|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE |
|
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY MOTION - COMPEL DISCOVERY |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT RULE 239(a) NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
DISM NOTICE FINAL DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT MOTION - FOR ENTRY |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.