Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ogletree, Kendall, Williams Ogletree, Leslie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Rodriguez, Victor R, against Clark, Christopher, Community Waste Disposal, L.P., Cwd Management, Inc., Cwd Nevada Holding, Inc., represented by Forte, Efrain, Iii, Sharp, Michael Paul, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 193rd District Court with WHITMORE, BRIDGETT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWHITMORE, BRIDGETT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House193rd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: June 14, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: August 19, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
193rd Jury Trial Notice Whitmore Jury Trial - Civil |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL MAILED NOTE - CLERKS |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
AGREED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL MOTION - DISMISS AGREED |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - CHRISTOPHER CLARK RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFFS NOTICE SERVICE AND FILING RECORD AFFIDAVITS AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE AND FILING RECORD AFFIDAVITS |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION CHRISTOPHER CLARK |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
FIRST AMENDED PETITION AMENDED PETITION |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
ISSUE CITATION- CHRISTOPHER CLARK ISSUE CITATION |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE LETTER CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.