Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mclain, Imogene, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Keith, Jillian, against Veritex Community Bank, Veritex Holdings, Inc., represented by Clark, Brian W., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 68th District Court with HOFFMAN, MARTIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHOFFMAN, MARTIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House68th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: June 11, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS ORDER NONSUIT TO PLAINITFF AND DEFENDANT |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR FWD SIGNED NONSUIT ORDER TO CLERKS |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR FWD NONSUIT TO JUDGE FOR REV |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER OF NONSUIT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - VEITEX HOLDINGS, INC. AND VERITEX COMMUNITY BANK ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - VERITEX COMMUNITY BANK RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - VERITEX HOLDINGS, INC RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION VERITEX HOLDINGS, INC |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION VERITEX COMMUNITY BANK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.