Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ruiz, Bonnie Lynn, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mingle, Michelle, against Letourneau University, represented by Newby, Kristin Bussell, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 95th District Court with LEE, MIKE G presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLEE, MIKE G Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 16, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House95th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
RELEASE OF JUDGMENT
Date: January 20, 2021NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: December 22, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 18, 2020ORDER - ATTORNEY FEES
Date: December 16, 2020SETTLED
Date: October 16, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 16, 2020MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: December 15, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 15, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: November 30, 2020ORDER - APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: October 21, 2020MOTION - GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: October 16, 2020Minor Prove Up
Date: December 17, 2020NOTE - CLERKS
Date: October 22, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 16, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | RELEASE OF JUDGMENT | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF AGREED JUDGMENT RULE 306(a)(3) NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED (2) - ALL PARTIES |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT WITH AMENDED EXHIBITS NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PROVE-UP HEARING Minor Prove Up *15 MIN *SET BY TERRIE BRYAN *VIA ZOOM |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - ATTORNEY FEES | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
REPORT OF GUARDIADN AD LITEM MISCELLANOUS EVENT |
|
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER FOR RELEASE OF GAL AND FEES NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PROVE-UP HEARING NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
ENVELOPE / MAILED COPY/ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM/TERRI BRYAN NOTE - CLERKS - MAILED COPY/ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM/TERRI BRYAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.