Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jefferson Capital Systems Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Clark, Matthew P., against Chiles, Richard, Windes, Michele, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 95th District Court with LEE, MIKE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLEE, MIKE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2020 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House95th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: August 24, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 24, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 09, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION (2) - ALL PARTIES |
|
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
UNEXECUTED CITATION: RICHARD CHILES RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
dwop hearing notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
MAILED COPY OF ORDER OF NONSUIT - MATTHEW P CLARK NOTE - CLERKS - MAILED COPIES/ORDER OF NONSUIT/PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY & DEFENDANT, RICHARD CHILES |
|
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER - NONSUIT / RICHARD CHILES ORDER - NONSUIT - RICHARD CHILES |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING NOTICE OF NONSUIT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER GRANTING NOTICE OF NONSUIT |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
COVER LETTER FOR NOTICE OF NONSUIT CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NONSUIT | |
December 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
dwop hearing notice NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR Set for Dismissal. Notice e-mailed to counsel. |
|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
UNEXECUTED CITATION - MICHELE WINDES RETURN OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.