Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Milligan, Dawn Wayne, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 95th District Court with PURDY, MONICA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePURDY, MONICA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 13, 2020 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House95th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR
Date: May 20, 2021NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: June 04, 2021NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR
Date: April 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION- DAWN WAYNE MILLIGAN NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
dwop hearing notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
dwop hearing notice NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR Dismissal re-set. E-mailed Movant. |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
dwop hearing notice NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR Dismissal re-set. E-mailed Movant. |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
dwop hearing notice NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR Dismissal re-set. E-mailed Dawn Milligan. |
|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
dwop hearing notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION Requested extension - Advised needed to appear and speak with Judge Purdy. |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE LETTER RE: STATUS UPDATE LETTER CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE: STATUS UPDATE LETTER |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
dwop hearing notice NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR Dismissal re-set. Notice mailed and e-mailed to Dawn Milligan. |
|
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
dwop hearing notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
December 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
dwop hearing notice NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR Set for Dismissal. Notice e-mailed to petitioner. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.