Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bullard, Kaylyn, Sain, Adam, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Wormington, Maria L, against Doe, John, Laboratory Corporation Of America, Laboratory Corporation Of America Holdings, represented by Bailey, Blake Allen, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 116th District Court with PARKER, TONYA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePARKER, TONYA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 17, 2020 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court House116th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Kaylyn Bullard and Adam Sain against Laboratory Corporation of America (LabCorp) and John Doe. The plaintiffs allege negligence and malpractice on the part of LabCorp and its employees, specifically a labor...
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 17, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 14, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 24, 2020ISSUE CITATION
Date: July 17, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 24, 2020NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT
Date: August 20, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANTS LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA NOTICE OF REMOVAL NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANTS' ORIGINAL ANSWER ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES |
|
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION: LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION: LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA D/B/A LABCORP RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS |
|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA D/B/A LABCORP |
|
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION | |
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
ISSUE CITATION - LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS ISSUE CITATION |
|
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event | NEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.