Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Tanguma, Jessica, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Eldridge, V. Paige, against Allstate Fire Casualty Insurance Company, Metropolitan Lloyd'S Insurance Company Of Texas, represented by Jenkins, Young C., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 193rd District Court with WHITMORE, BRIDGETT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWHITMORE, BRIDGETT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 16, 2020 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House193rd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 18, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 16, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 05, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Jury Trial - Civil |
|
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
193RD Initial Dismissal Notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
MAILED COPY OF ORDER NONSUIT TO METROPOLITIAN LLOYD'S INS CO OF TEXAS NOTE - CLERKS MAILED COPY OF ORDER NONSUIT TO ALL PARTIES |
|
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORER NONSUIT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER NONSUIT |
|
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE NONSUIT NOTICE OF NONSUIT |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER (LEVEL 3) SCHEDULING ORDER LEVEL 3 |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL / ALLSTATE ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION METROPOLITAN LLOYD'S INSURANCE COMPANY OF TEXAS |
|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION ALLSTATE FIRE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event | JURY DEMAND |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.