Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, Na, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Sellers, Thomas M., against Edwards, Carl, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 160th District Court with REDMOND, AIESHA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREDMOND, AIESHA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 16, 2020 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House160th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 16, 2020Final Disposition Hearing
Date: November 03, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 23, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF-RELEASE OF JUDGMENT RELEASE OF JUDGMENT |
|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Notice Final Disposition Hearing |
|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF AGREED JUDGMENT RULE 306(a)(3) NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
AGREED JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
160th Dismissal DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION CASE FILED 7-16-20; DEF UNSERVED |
|
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER RETAIN NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION RETAIN MOTION - RETAIN PLAINTIFF |
|
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION -CARL EDWARDS RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION CARL EDWARDS |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.